Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2359 on 12/07/1929
British Railways 42359 w/e 14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 12/07/1929
Withdrawal Sat 24/10/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/07/1929
11B   Barrow in Furness on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A   Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
14D   Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
1A   Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
8E   Northwich w/e 15/08/1959
24L   Carnforth w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn on 24/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 8E Northwich 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 8E Northwich 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 24/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders.
On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.'
Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12.
SLS/195001
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/07/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2359
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B)    
14/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42359    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
24/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42359    
03/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev