Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 236 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5636 Week
» 23688 Month
» 256608 Year
» 1921984 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2361 on 23/07/1929
British Railways 42361 w/e 01/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/07/1929
Withdrawal Sat 08/02/1964
Service Life 34 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/07/1929
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16D   Annesley w/e 10/01/1959
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 23/01/1960
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 07/01/1961
9G   Gorton w/e 10/11/1962
     Withdrawn on 08/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 01/12/1962
WDN   w/e 08/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
30/12/1961 Leicester to Rugby last day Owing to the very bad weather on 30th December (which spread to the Home Counties the next day) very few people were travelling. In the morning 42062 an 46446 were working passenger traffic while 48363/6 were noted on freight duties with 92030 on a diverted Toton-Willesden goods. The last official goods, Leicester-Rugby, was the 10-58 a.m. Toton-Sudbury Junc. which entered the branch at Wigston at 2 p.m. with 48311 (55B). Following this came 42331 on the Leicester Society's special. The 2-55 p.m. Leicester-Rugby had 42361 and this returned on the 4-20 p.m. from Rugby which was followed by the return of daily 'pick-up' (2-45 p.m. ex Rugby) worked by 43028-the last goods on the branch. The 5.3 p.m. Leicester-Rugby was hauled by 46446 and the 5-45 p.m. Leicester -Rugby by 42062 which formed the 7-28 p.m. ex Rugby and 9-40 p.m. ex Leicester, the last trains each way. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/07/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2361
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
01/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42361    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
10/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
08/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42361    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev