Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 261 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5661 Week
» 23713 Month
» 256633 Year
» 1922009 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2362 on 26/07/1929
British Railways 42362 w/e 16/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 26/07/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/06/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/07/1929
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A   Rugby 4w/e 28/12/1957
9C   Macclesfield 4w/e 25/01/1958
5D   Stoke 4w/e 22/03/1958
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1959
91W   To Western Region / GWR w/e 29/08/1959
5D   Stoke w/e 12/09/1959
8E   Northwich w/e 02/07/1960
5D   Stoke w/e 10/09/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 02/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 20/12/1947
EXLOAN 9C Macclesfield w/e 21/02/1948
LOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957
EXLOAN 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/03/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 84G*   4w/e 21/02/1959
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/02/1959
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 3w/e 26/09/1959
LOAN 8E Northwich 5w/e 02/07/1960
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 24/09/1960
WDN   w/e 02/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Central Wales Line (ex L.N.W.R.): For a considerable time the small sheds at Builth Road and Knighton have housed three 18' ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-0 'Cauliflowers,' one at the former and two at the latter; however, it now seems that the class has been displaced and the banking duties at each shed are performed by ex M.R. Class '3.F' 0-6-70's at Knighton, and whatever can be provided at Builth Road. During the week-end Sept. 20/21 2-6-4T 2349 (4A) and 2362 (4B) were outside the Builth Road shed (it is apparently too small for them to enter!) and during the week-end Sept. 27/28 3679 (4A) and 3581 (4A) were on Knighton shed. One of the Knighton locos. has a regular turn every other day to Craven Arms and back. SLS/194712
07/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 7/10/50:-50 1A, 40332 5A, 40478 16A, 41165 2A, 41181 9E, 1186 26C, 41187 27A, 41686 16A, 42362 9A, 42395 11B, 43795 18A, 43992 18B, 44175 22B, 44400 20E, 7674 6C, 53803 22C, 58059 15D, (6)4782 30A, 64807 38A. Ex Works: 41050, 43435, 64737, 43456, 44180, 58090, 58237. SLS/195012
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/07/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2362
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
16/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42362    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
02/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42362    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev