Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 736 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1810 Week
» 27171 Month
» 260091 Year
» 1925467 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2364 on 09/08/1929
British Railways 42364 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 09/08/1929
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/08/1929
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 08/08/1953
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1950 Derby Works For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E.
New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station.
Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted).
SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/08/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2364
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42364    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42364    
03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev