Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2365 on 14/08/1929
British Railways 42365 w/e 11/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 14/08/1929
Withdrawal Sat 08/10/1960
Service Life 31 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/08/1929
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight 4w/e 10/08/1957
1A   Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
8E   Northwich w/e 15/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 08/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 8E Northwich 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 8E Northwich 5w/e 31/10/1959
WDN   w/e 08/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. SLS/195004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2365
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
11/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42365    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
08/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 42365    
11/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev