|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/01/1961 | Derby MPD | Ex-Works on Shed: 42209/366/503/09/19, 43854, 53810, 73136/8, 48073. | SLS/196102 |
15/12/1961 | Derby Works (Paint Shop) | Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/08/1929 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2366 Built at Derby Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) | ||
27/05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42366 | ||
06/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke (5D) | ||
30/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
22/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
19/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
15/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southport (27C) | ||
19/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
30/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
11/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42366 | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |