Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2370 on 16/09/1929
British Railways 42370 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/09/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/06/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/09/1929
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 30/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1958 Derby Works (Yard) 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/09/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2370
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42370    
30/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42370    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev