30/04/1950 |
Derby Works |
Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. |
SLS/195006 |
21/10/1950 |
Derby Works |
For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation). New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages. Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10). Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler. Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10). |
SLS/195012 |
13/02/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop, 1 bay) |
Paint shop-40563I, 43924G, 44606G, 47341G, 48538G, 73038G, 80066G, D5011 new. D/E Erecting shop-10000/1, 10203, 10800, 12000, 12082, 13083, 13169, D3568, D8014, new work-D3763-D3767 new. Outside-dED2. Test House-D5009/10. Erecting shop, 1 bay- 42374G, 42501G, 42520I, 44216I, 44518I, 47223G, 47379G, 47405G, 48003G, 48010G, 48317I, 48367G, 48409I, 73126I, 73159I, 75056G, 80088G, 42409 an 47376 stripping. Erecting shop, 2 bay- 42136I, 44477I, 48011I, 73125I, 73128I, 48050 stripping. Erecting shop, 3 bay- 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D/E D5012-8 new, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/Es, D5008. Yard- 40047, 40680, 42354, 43946, 43970, 47309, 48364 frames, 48517, 10100, D2910, D8001. |
SLS/195903 |
10/03/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop No. 2 bay) |
Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. |
SLS/195904 |
12/07/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. |
SLS/196108 |
14/08/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. |
SLS/196109 |
19/09/1961 |
Derby Works (In Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. |
SLS/196110 |
06/04/1962 |
Derby MPD (Ex-Works) |
Ex-Works on Shed : D160/1, 42089, 42374, 42401, 47165, 47643/67, 48099, 48442. |
SLS/196205 |