Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 886 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1960 Week
» 27321 Month
» 260241 Year
» 1925617 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2376 on 18/05/1932
British Railways 42376 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 18/05/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 19/01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/05/1932
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11B   Barrow in Furness w/e 07/04/1951
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 19/05/1951
11A   Barrow in Furness w/e 02/01/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 07/04/1951
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/05/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2376
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
23/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42376    
07/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
02/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11A)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42376    
19/01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev