Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2378 on 01/06/1932
British Railways 42378 w/e 29/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 01/06/1932
Withdrawal Sat 18/04/1964
Service Life 31 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/06/1932
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1C   Watford w/e 08/04/1950
4A   Bletchley 4w/e 31/12/1950
5D   Stoke w/e 03/03/1951
5D   Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1951
2A   Rugby 8w/e 05/10/1957
5D   Stoke 4w/e 30/11/1957
24L   Carnforth w/e 21/07/1962
     Withdrawn on 18/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 5D Stoke m/e 31/01/1946
EXLOAN 5D Stoke w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 1C Watford w/e 08/04/1950
ALLOC 4A Bletchley m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 03/03/1951
LOAN 2A Rugby 4w/e 05/10/1957
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 18/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/12/1958 Derby Works (1 bay stripping) Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. SLS/195901
16/01/1959 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42378/81, 43940, 47451/583, 48611. Diesel shop-ED2, 10000/100/800, 12000/035/082, D3020, 13037, D8014. New work-0-6-0 shunters D3763/4; outside-ED7, D5001/2/6. Test House-D5005/7/8. Erecting shop-1 bay-42511I, 42610 G, 44167G, 44338I, 44535G, 44587G, 47000I, 47421I, 48006/217 G, 48370/533G, 75017I. Stripping-48654, 73038, 75035. Erecting shop-2 bay-40035I, 42533G, 42542I, 44277I, 48267I, 53808I, 48317 stripping. Erecting shop-3 bay-7 Bo-Bos (D5009-15new) 1160 H.P., 5 1-Co-Co-ls 2300 H.P. Yard-40047/680/3180/7309, 58209. SLS/195902
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/06/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2378
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
29/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42378    
08/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (4A)    
03/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
21/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
18/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42378    
08/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev