Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 835 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1909 Week
» 27270 Month
» 260190 Year
» 1925566 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2379 on 08/06/1932
British Railways 42379 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/06/1932
Withdrawal Sat 01/08/1964
Service Life 32 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/06/1932
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 20/03/1948
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 02/01/1960
12H   Tebay w/e 17/06/1961
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 16/09/1961
26A   Newton Heath w/e 06/07/1963
     Withdrawn on 01/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 20/03/1948
ALLOC 12H Tebay 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 01/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2379
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
20/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42379    
02/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
01/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42379    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev