Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 257 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5657 Week
» 23709 Month
» 256629 Year
» 1922005 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2381 on 22/06/1932
British Railways 42381 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 22/06/1932
Withdrawal Sat 08/05/1965
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/06/1932
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight 4w/e 19/05/1956
2A   Rugby w/e 12/11/1960
2E   Northampton w/e 06/05/1961
6H   Bangor w/e 16/06/1962
5D   Stoke w/e 01/12/1962
5C   Stafford w/e 11/07/1964
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 20/12/1947
EXLOAN 9C Macclesfield w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 2A Rugby 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 2E Northampton 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601
23/09/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 23/9/50:-40497 35C, 40532 35C, 41153 6A, 42381 9A, 43259 17A, 3321 21A, 43789 20C, 44235 71G, 44565 17D, 46404 15B, 7509 25E, 22975 (58154) 20E, 58091 15D (W)2060 82C. Ex Works: 2108, 40527, 41118, 43854, 43929/59/68, 44010, 44402, 47451, 47588, 64906/69.
Withdrawn engines: Nos. 1251, 1406, 3511, 40515, 40498, 41017, 43818, 22853 an 58236 were still in the yard on 29/9, but since that date several have been fitted with tenders for supplying steam at carriage sidings, including 3511, 40515, 41017, 43297 and possibly 43818. The other four still in the yard have been joined by 58059 (9/10).
SLS/195012
19/12/1958 Derby Works (1 bay stripping) Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. SLS/195901
16/01/1959 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42378/81, 43940, 47451/583, 48611. Diesel shop-ED2, 10000/100/800, 12000/035/082, D3020, 13037, D8014. New work-0-6-0 shunters D3763/4; outside-ED7, D5001/2/6. Test House-D5005/7/8. Erecting shop-1 bay-42511I, 42610 G, 44167G, 44338I, 44535G, 44587G, 47000I, 47421I, 48006/217 G, 48370/533G, 75017I. Stripping-48654, 73038, 75035. Erecting shop-2 bay-40035I, 42533G, 42542I, 44277I, 48267I, 53808I, 48317 stripping. Erecting shop-3 bay-7 Bo-Bos (D5009-15new) 1160 H.P., 5 1-Co-Co-ls 2300 H.P. Yard-40047/680/3180/7309, 58209. SLS/195902
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204
16/03/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D156/8/9, D2236, D2904, D5023/6/73, D5145, 42327/81, 42409, 43953, 44180, 47295, 47441/4, 47515, 48533. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/06/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2381
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42381    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
01/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
11/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42381    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev