Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1638 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15044 Week
» 68060 Month
» 187587 Year
» 3214440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2382 |
on |
29/06/1932 |
British Railways |
42382 |
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 29/06/1932 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1961 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
29/06/1932 |
9C |
|
Macclesfield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
9B |
|
Stockport Edgeley |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/06/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2382 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42382 |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42382 |
|
|
12/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|