Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 235 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5635 Week
» 23687 Month
» 256607 Year
» 1921983 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2382 on 29/06/1932
British Railways 42382 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 29/06/1932
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 29 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/06/1932
9C   Macclesfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2382
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
26/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42382    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42382    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev