Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 320 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5720 Week
» 23772 Month
» 256692 Year
» 1922068 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2383 on 07/07/1932
British Railways 42383 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 07/07/1932
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 08/08/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/07/1932
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley 4w/e 06/11/1954
18A   Toton w/e 23/04/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/07/1932 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2383
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42383    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42383    
08/08/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev