13/01/1951 |
Derby Works |
During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. |
SLS/195102 |
28/02/1951 |
Derby Works |
During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
12/11/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. |
SLS/195912 |
12/07/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. |
SLS/196108 |
16/03/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. |
SLS/196204 |
31/07/1962 |
Withdrawn GWR engines |
It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. |
SLS/196210 |
07/09/1962 |
Derby Works (Foundry Row) |
Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). |
SLS/196210 |