Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 257 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5657 Week
» 23709 Month
» 256629 Year
» 1922005 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2388 on 25/05/1933
British Railways 42388 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 25/05/1933
Withdrawal Fri 02/11/1962 (At Derby Works)
Withdrawal Notes At Derby Works
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 10/11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/05/1933
4B   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
87H   Neyland 4w/e 16/07/1955
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 10/09/1955
87E   Landore 4w/e 05/09/1959
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 17/06/1961
     Withdrawn on 02/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 17/06/1961
WDN   on 02/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006
30/11/1950 Derby Works In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed.
Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal.
SLS/195101
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102
27/12/1958 Warwick MPD Further to a recent note, 41227/8/85 an 42566 were officially transferred to W.R. 13th December, 1958, but on 20th December 42566 was transferred back to Rugby and its daily parcels turn was worked (from 22nd December) by 82031 (84G) until 9th January when Fowler 2-6-4T 42388 (87K-Swansea) appeared on this duty. SLS/195902
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/05/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2388
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B)    
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42388    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
02/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42388    
10/11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev