Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 818 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1892 Week
» 27253 Month
» 260173 Year
» 1925549 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2391 on 05/06/1933
British Railways 42391 w/e 14/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/06/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/03/1963
Service Life 29 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 03/05/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/06/1933
5C   Stafford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight 4w/e 27/12/1952
9A   Longsight 5w/e 03/01/1953
9B   Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 03/11/1956
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 02/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 5C Stafford w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 02/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Ex Works Shed) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104
17/03/1963 Carlisle Kingmoor MPD (Foundry Sdg.) In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. SLS/196304
11/04/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Sdg.) Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. SLS/196304
27/04/1963 Birmingham Excursions (Foundry Sdg.) On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/06/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2391
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stafford (5C)    
14/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42391    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
03/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
02/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42391    
03/05/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev