Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2394 on 22/06/1933
British Railways 42394 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 22/06/1933
Withdrawal Sun 05/06/1966
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/06/1933
4B   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
87E   Landore 4w/e 05/09/1959
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 17/06/1961
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 12/08/1962
55A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 04/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/08/1962
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 91NE   5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1951 Derby Works During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. SLS/195103
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
09/07/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed : D5003 (1A), 42112 (9E), 42394 (87D), 47395 (8F), 75036 (6G), 75057 (15C). SLS/196208
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/06/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2394
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B)    
04/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42394    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
12/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
04/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42394    
10/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev