Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2395 on 28/08/1933
British Railways 42395 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 28/08/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/11/1961
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/08/1933
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9C   Macclesfield w/e 07/02/1948
11B   Barrow in Furness w/e 10/07/1948
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1959
91W   To Western Region / GWR w/e 29/08/1959
11A   Barrow in Furness w/e 12/09/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DA   w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 84G*   4w/e 21/02/1959
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/02/1959
EXLOAN 11A Barrow in Furness 3w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   w/e 18/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay) Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. SLS/195909
17/11/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. SLS/196112
15/12/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. SLS/196201
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Shed road) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/08/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2395
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
25/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42395    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11A)    
18/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42395    
04/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev