Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 754 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1828 Week
» 27189 Month
» 260109 Year
» 1925485 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2396 on 29/08/1933
British Railways 42396 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 29/08/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/07/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 13/09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/08/1933
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11E   Tebay w/e 17/07/1948
     Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11E Tebay w/e 17/07/1948
WDN   w/e 07/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/05/1957 Shap Wells Pacific 46256 'Sir William Stanier' was noted making a brisk climb with the Mid-day Scot. On the same day banking was being carried out by Fowler 2-6-4T's 42396 an 42403/4. A particularly brisk climb of the bank, with a tremendous pyrotechnic display, was noted on the evening of (21/5) SLS/195707
10/03/1959 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. SLS/195904
11/02/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay) Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/08/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2396
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (11E)    
18/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42396    
07/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42396    
13/09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev