Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 518 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18321 Week
» 71337 Month
» 190864 Year
» 3217717 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2398 |
on |
04/09/1933 |
British Railways |
42398 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 04/09/1933 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 03/12/1960 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 04/02/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
04/09/1933 |
9A |
|
Longsight |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
21A |
|
Saltley |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
27/08/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2398 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42398 |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42398 |
|
|
04/02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|