Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 309 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5709 Week
» 23761 Month
» 256681 Year
» 1922057 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2398 on 04/09/1933
British Railways 42398 w/e 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 04/09/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/12/1960
Service Life 27 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 04/02/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/09/1933
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley w/e 20/08/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 03/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/08/1960
WDN   w/e 03/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/09/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2398
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
13/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42398    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
03/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 42398    
04/02/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev