Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2399 on 06/09/1933
British Railways 42399 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/09/1933
Withdrawal Sat 03/09/1960
Service Life 26 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/09/1933
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 03/09/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 03/09/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/07/1950 Derby Works Observations (22/6) U.T.A. 54 ready for despatch, 55 completed, 56 and 57 under construction. (29/6) 56 completed. (6/7) 57 almost finished. New 2-6-4T 42145 in paint shop (22/6): 42146 almost ready (6/7). Diesel-electric shunters 12069/70 complete on 22/6, 12071 to follow. Being cut up (22/6) 727, 41039, 3173: already cut up 58041, 58082. In store near station 404, 40411, 40416, 43364 (22/6 to 6/7). Repainted with emblem: 43861, 44313, 58127, 12035, 44050, 47282, 44338, 43310, 47207, 44132, 44558, 47672, 44179, 58293, 43356; also with lining 42348, 42350, 40053, 40694, 41063, 42399, 40931, 41064. Off works: 40631 (plain tender); lettered L.M.S., 43490, 43575, 44559, 41079, 41100, 42341, 43203, 43267, 44241, 44559, 58070, 44174, 40060, 40063, 41016, 43399, 58189 (tender cab). Lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS: 44030, 40055, 41074 (tall chimney); also with lining 42304, 40055. In works yard (22/6-6/7): 40556, 58036, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 22853. 10800 was on trial, on 22/6 with dynamometer car and six bogies, and a week later on test run with dynamometer car and five bogies-Derby-Leicester-Manchester-Derby. The first set of frames for No. 1 of Order 4310 (? 2-6-0) were set up early' in July.
46100 is now 'Taper Scot' green livery, with smoke deflectors, number on smokebox door, no bell, and the large nameplates which were put on the old engine after her return from U.S.A. (These are not correct for the engine as it is now). 46210 is the first of its class to be painted blue, and is in traffic. 58394 (ex 28509) has come off works and so escaped the melting-pot for a time.
SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/09/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2399
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42399    
03/09/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 42399    
11/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev