Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 877 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1951 Week
» 27312 Month
» 260232 Year
» 1925608 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2400 on 13/09/1933
British Railways 42400 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/09/1933
Withdrawal Sat 23/01/1965
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/09/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke 4w/e 27/03/1954
9A   Longsight 4w/e 09/08/1958
5C   Stafford 4w/e 06/09/1958
21A   Saltley w/e 20/08/1960
5C   Stafford w/e 16/05/1964
5C   Stafford w/e 20/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 23/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Greenock Ladyburn w/e 02/11/1946
LOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 23/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1948 St. Rollox Works No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon and a 'Wick & Lybster' tank No. 15053 arrived at the Works on 12/10 and 19/10 respectively, both for attention to their boilers; 15053 still retains the H.R. building plates. Locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here during October 1948 (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) were as follows; - with 8' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' Nos. 40598 (3810) 12; 45017 (9530) 10; 45163 (9267) 26; 45309 (9719) 20; 45364 (9185) 4; 45463 (9725) 18; 45481 (9281) 31; 45485 (9831) 4; 45489 (9269) 7; 45583 (9030) 14; 45728 (9025) 22; - with 8' numerals and 8' 'British Railways' Nos. 41128 29; 42746 (4345) 13; 42832 (4167) 22; 42836 (4213) 20; 43883 (2976) 13; 43996 (3085) 27; 54457 (6041) 27; 54505 (6039) 15; 57344 (6014) 20; 57456 (1343) 25; 57697 (1873) 12; 57955 31; - with 8' numerals and 6' 'British Railways' Nos. 40150 15; 40185 28; 42209 31; 42400 6; 55124 11; 56169 13; - with 10' numerals and 10' 'British Railways' No. 54496 (6210) 13; - with 8' numerals and retaining L.M.S. on the tender No. 45053 (9127) 18. Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock and treated with a full paint schedule (tender number in brackets, followed by date to Varnish Shop) were as follows:-Nos. 57435 (1308) 30/9; 57581 (1662) 1/10; 56256 4/10; 56237 6/10; 57575 (6049) 11/10; 57622 (1703) 8/10; 56262 11/10; *55223 21/10; 57638 26/10; 57653 30/10; 56165 5/11. *Fully lined, as also was No. 55233, which was referred to last month. SLS/194812
31/10/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40189, 669, 42212, 42400, 42833, 43996, 44325, 5466, 54456, 54638, 16338, 57618. SLS/194912
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907
17/08/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. SLS/195909
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. SLS/196204
01/10/1962 Redditch-Ashchurch From 1st October the section of line between Broom Junc. and Evesham is to be closed completely. The Redditch-Ashchurch service is still with the T.U.C.C. but the Engineer has refused to be responsible for any further traffic between Broom and Evesham after Saturday, 29th September. This section of line has the new sleepers waiting for installation, but apparently the expenditure will not be sanctioned. It is understood that buses will operate between Evesham and Alcester (or Redditch) from 1/10 to replace the passenger trains, and goods traffice will be suspended except that Alcester will be open for goods traffic (via Redditch). On Saturday, 22nd September, 42400/17/21 were all working on the branch trains through from Birmingham New St.-Ashchurch and Jinty' 47308 replaced 42421 on the 11-38 a.m. Redditch-Ashchurch, back with the 1-15 p.m. from Ashchurch-Redditch. 42421 resumed with the 2-55 p.m. ex Redditch and apparently this has been a regular working of a Jinty on Saturdays. MR Class 3s (and GW PTs) have been noted but it is believed that GW PTs cannot work the Redditch sidings-wherefore the keeping of 47296 at Bromsgrove to change with 47308. SLS/196210
04/12/1963 Saltley MPD Of the Fowler 2-6-4Ts, 42419 was condemned 4th December, 42417 is waiting works (?) leaving 42400/16/21 in traffic, although Drivers complain they have inadequate brake power on goods trains. 46505/26/9 have arrived, the latter two green; some Class 4Fs are to come out of store, probably for Bescot in lieu of LNW Super Ds. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/09/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2400
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42400    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
16/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
23/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42400    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev