Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 836 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1910 Week
» 27271 Month
» 260191 Year
» 1925567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2402 on 20/09/1933
British Railways 42402 w/e 22/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/09/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Service Life 29 yrs , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/09/1933
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11B   Barrow in Furness w/e 10/07/1948
     Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 9A Longsight w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 10/07/1948
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/10/1950 Derby Works For shops W/E 28/10/50:-12058 18A, 40065 26A, 40433 7D, 41044 15D, 41049 17D, 41053 15C, 41166 8E, 41167 5A, 41193 27A, 42312 25B, 42402 11B, 43294 18D, 3748 15C, 3932 22B, 44176 21A, 47160 6C, 7235 19A, 47591 8B, 64787 30F. No. 40433 is for special examination, which may mean withdrawal. SLS/195012
11/06/1954 Cumbrian Coast At Ravenglass on the same date, No. 43009 (fitted with single chimney) was on the 1.30 p.m. from Whitehaven, while the corresponding excursion from Barrow was headed by No. 42402. On the Ravenglass and Eskdale Railway both the 'Rivers' were out and in steam. Manager Harry Hilton was in good form, and as the compiler of these notes will be staying in Ravenglass during August, it is hoped to provide some details on the present situation and future of the line. SLS/195408
14/04/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop, No. 2 bay) Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. SLS/195905
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/09/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2402
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
22/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42402    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42402    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev