Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2403 on 26/09/1933
British Railways 42403 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 26/09/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 29 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/09/1933
11D   Oxenholme 4w/e 22/06/1946
11E   Tebay on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/05/1957 Shap Wells Pacific 46256 'Sir William Stanier' was noted making a brisk climb with the Mid-day Scot. On the same day banking was being carried out by Fowler 2-6-4T's 42396 an 42403/4. A particularly brisk climb of the bank, with a tremendous pyrotechnic display, was noted on the evening of (21/5) SLS/195707
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2403
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Oxenholme (11D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tebay (11E)    
02/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42403    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42403    
07/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev