Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2406 on 10/10/1933
British Railways 42406 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/10/1933
Withdrawal Sat 28/08/1965
Service Life 31 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/10/1933
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield w/e 30/07/1949
56A   Wakefield w/e 29/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 28/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 29/03/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 30/07/1949
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   on 28/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/07/1950 Derby Works 42146 almost complete; UTA.56 complete and painted; UTA.57 nearly complete. First two sets of frames in position for order No. 4310. Nos. 404, 40411/6, 43364 in store near station, joined a fortnight later by 43342 an 43482. Fresh off Works: 47000, 2035, 43900/61 repainted with emblem; 42503, 43985, 44007, 44200, 47233, 58075, 58234 lettered L.M.S.; 40656, 40925, 41064/96, 42377/93 lined black, with emblem; 40671 'British Railways'; 42311 unlined. In Paint Shop 58054 (ex 1341) with emblem. For shops W/E 15/7/50: 434, 40535, 41051, 41168, 1889, 42351/3, 42406, 3101, 43690, 43892/98, 44112/72, 7342, 58224, 64722, 64951, 4969. Still in Works Yard at end of July: 22853, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 58036, 58229 (condemned). 24/7/50: Ex Works: 2070 still lettered G.W.R. 64827 repainted with emblem; 64903, tender lettered L.N.E.R.; 42503 lettered L.M.S. 30/7/50: 42146, UTA.56/57, Order 4310 as on 13th. Nos. 12070/1 complete, 12072/3 almost complete; 10800 in Diesel shop; 41060 lined with 'British Railways' on tender; 41181 has tender unlined with emblem; 42340 lined black with emblem. SLS/195010
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2406
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42406    
30/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
28/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42406    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev