Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2407 on 12/10/1933
British Railways 42407 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 12/10/1933
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 29 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/10/1933
25F   Low Moor on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield w/e 30/07/1949
25C   Goole 4w/e 24/03/1956
56D   Mirfield 5w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 25F Low Moor w/e 29/03/1947
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 02/08/1947
EXLOAN 25F Low Moor w/e 20/09/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 30/07/1949
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006
01/02/1964 Branch line news (Scrap Yard) Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April.
The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964.
SLS/196403
07/03/1964 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/10/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2407
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
30/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
22/04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42407    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42407    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev