Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 33 Online
» 813 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1887 Week
» 27248 Month
» 260168 Year
» 1925544 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2408 on 18/10/1933
British Railways 42408 w/e 24/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Tue 18/10/1933
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/10/1933
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 22/06/1946
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
55D   Royston w/e 07/11/1959
55C   Farnley Junction w/e 18/06/1960
55A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 26/11/1960
55G   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 16/03/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 55C Farnley Junction 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 31/03/1963
WDN   w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders.
On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.'
Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12.
SLS/195001
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002
19/09/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
07/09/1962 Derby Works (Stone Pitt) Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/10/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2408
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
24/12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42408    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42408    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev