Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2410 on 25/10/1933
British Railways 42410 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 25/10/1933
Withdrawal Sun 04/09/1966
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/10/1933
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 04/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 30/03/1946
WDN   on 04/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/12/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop: 1 bay) Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. SLS/195901
15/05/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106
01/04/1964 Crewe Works (Yard) Erecting Shop: New Construction, D1583-98 (in various stages), D205/27/46/70/86, D303/7/28/30/83/87, D5717, D6775/84, D6863/78, D8002/6/7/23/50, 44918, 45382/408/577/626, 46443, 48169/225/69/474/528/615/37/95/729/42, 70000/4/10, 82009 92121/22. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, D5719, D6783/9, 45426, 48154/436/742/50, 78041, 92137. Electric Shop: D204, D6843, E3007, 26000/9, 27003. Yard: 42055/81, 42410/583/699, 43957, 44405, 44676/873/917/87, 45217/372/445, 45569/658, 46436/41/524, 48073/258/332/424/613/749, 84021/3/4, 92002/62/156/73. Inside and Around Paint Shop: New Construction, D1563, D1567-82. Weigh Shed: 48753. Outside Paint Shop: D201/23/339, 26006, 45069/75, 48185/436/734, 92082/163. Inside Paint Shop: D259, D311, D1034, 49395, 92053 and L.M.S. 6229 Duchess of Hamilton, painted in L.M.S livery (for a Butlins Camp). SLS/196405
03/05/1964 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Awaiting Works at Scrap Yard: 44835, 45064, 48053, 48354, 48717, 70022. Awaiting Scrap at Scrap Yard: 42897, 42922, 48140, 48209. Diesel Erecting Shop: D277, D342, D349, D6843, 26005, 26034, 26048. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D205, D210, D219, D241, D255, D274, D1582 painted, D1583, D1585 undercoat, D1609, D1610, D1611 shell only, 26047, 27006, 46457. Outside Erecting Shop: D254, 42081, 42410, 45080, 45112, 45217, 48528, 92156, 92177. Erecting Shop: D226, D248, D256, D315, D335, D336, D340, D1591 undercoat, D1592 nearly complete, D1593, D1594, D1595, D1596 motors mounted, D1597, D1598, D1599, D1600, D1601, D1602, D1603, D1604, D1605, D1606, D1607, D1608 shell only, D5719, D6789, D6794, D6884, D8050, 42055, 42085, 42394, 44665, 44873, 44884, 45132, 45147, 45182, 45336, 45354, 45415, 45647, 46436, 48211, 48258, 48313, 48424, 48746, 48749, 48759, 92026, 92030, 92085. Works Yard: 42583, 44662, 44872, 44898, 45000, 45271, 45558, 48070, 48171, 48371, 48462, 48538, 48602, 48613, 48684, 70010, 70024, 70049, 78002, 78007, 78017, 92062, 92102, 92126, 92154, 92166, 92227. Outside Paint Shop: D298, D1584 undercoat, D5717, D6775, D6863, D8002, D8027, 48742. Paint Shop: D1578 painted, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 undercoat, 26028. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/10/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2410
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42410    
04/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42410    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev