Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 293 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5693 Week
» 23745 Month
» 256665 Year
» 1922041 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2411 on 28/10/1933
British Railways 42411 w/e 15/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 28/10/1933
Withdrawal During 08/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/10/1933
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25C   Goole w/e 22/07/1950
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 31/12/1950
25C   Goole 4w/e 24/03/1956
54A   Sunderland 4w/e 12/04/1958
50A   York (North) 4w/e 16/08/1958
50B   Neville Hill 4w/e 11/10/1958
56F   Low Moor w/e 31/01/1959
56E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 10/10/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 18/06/1960
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 14/01/1961
56F   Low Moor w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn m/e 08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 22/07/1950
ALLOC 25D Mirfield m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 16/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1951 Derby Works During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. SLS/195109
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/10/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2411
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
15/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42411    
22/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
16/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42411    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev