Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 745 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1819 Week
» 27180 Month
» 260100 Year
» 1925476 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2413 on 04/11/1933
British Railways 42413 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 04/11/1933
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/11/1933
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 30/03/1946
WDN   on 25/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209
07/09/1962 Derby MPD Ex Works on Shed: D3121 (18A), D5000 (1A), D5141 (1A), 42075, 42413 (55G), 73090 (89A), 73159 (15E), 73163 (55G), 73167 (55E). 70046 (21D) was on shed and 48623 (2B) was noted on a West bound freight. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2413
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42413    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42413    
10/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev