Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2414 on 08/11/1933
British Railways 42414 w/e 25/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/11/1933
Withdrawal Sat 10/10/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/11/1933
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12H   Tebay w/e 09/12/1961
     Withdrawn on 10/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LMR   4w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 12H Tebay 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 10/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 14/10/50:-40585 27A, 40910 9E, 41057 17A, 41060 17A, 41080 20E, 1846 16A, 42301 11D, 42414 25B, 3058 (58204) 19C, 3274 9D, 43615 8B, 43885 18B, 43911 21A, 44408 16A, 44599 17B, 45594 19B. New Construction: 12077 in Paint Shop and 12078-80 complete on 9/10; 42052 on trials 29/9 and 42053 9/10; 42054/5 complete, 42056 almost complete and frames for next two down, 9/10; frames for the next diesel (d12081) are also laid down. Ex Works: 41062, 41154, 43914, 44598, 64980, 58209, 64962, 40351, 41068, 41006, 47548, 42353, 43456, 47481. No. 10800 was on test run on 29/9, and 10800 was standing outside the diesel shop on 9/10. SLS/195012
13/03/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104
13/04/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D210/69, D2501/8, D2903/9, D3126/72, D8006, 11116, 12077, 13119, 13245. Test House: ED2, D24/7, D76, D83, D255/68, D2910, D5015/61/89, D5140, 10203, 11114. New Building: D28-37, Finishing Shop: D74, D223/92, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42077, 42092, 42367, 42414/39, 42522, 43972, 44102, 44284, 44538, 44603, 47675, 48114, 48220/4, 48447, 48695, 53806, 73014/39, 73126/7. Paint Shop: D26, D78, M1000, 44177, 47278, 47318, 48143. In Works Sidings: D68, D86, D88, D3069, D5701, 12000, 41529/36, 41835, 42281, 44067/85/91, 44195, 44269, 47305/24/90, 47533, 48003, 48121, 48336, 48666, 58850, 73157. Ex-Works Shed: D79, D230, D3052, 47415/39, 48063, 48153, 48219, 48690. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2414
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
25/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42414    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12H)    
10/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42414    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev