Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1010 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6812 Week
» 18049 Month
» 250969 Year
» 1916345 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2415 on 13/11/1933
British Railways 42415 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/11/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 29 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/11/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6H   Bangor 4w/e 24/04/1954
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 10/08/1957
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/11/1959
21A   Saltley w/e 20/08/1960
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 21/01/1961
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 25/11/1961
24L   Carnforth w/e 23/06/1962
12H   Tebay w/e 14/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 12H Tebay 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender.
Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed
SLS/194807
09/07/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40636/89, 1125/27, 2246, 42415, 2696, 4328, 14630, 55166, 56282, 16332, 57264, 17383. SLS/194908
31/03/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 595, 612, 40907/11, 42208, 42415, 42738/44/57, 42805, 42916, 43973, 4183, 44801, 44956, 45085/86, 45100/16/17/56/61/64/68/92, 45356, 45458/75/80/83/89/99, 45646, 46121, 14443, 54460, 54649, 56153, 16230/33, 56240, 16241, 56263, 16288, 16322/30/47, 17265, 57272, 57311/35, 17410/44/46, 57566, 17628, 57652. SLS/195005
15/05/1954 Bangor MPD Much to the shed-master's chagrin, no L.N.W.R. 'old stagers' remain. The 'coal tank' has gone to Monument Lane, the 'Cauliflower' to Stoke-on-Trent, and the 2-4-2 tank to Crewe. The Amlwch branch is entirely worked by Ivatt 2-6-2 tanks, of which Bangor has Nos. 41200, 41212, 41223, an 41233. Periodic loads of iron pyrites are worked over the branch to the Associated Ethyl Corporation Works at Amlwch Port. The load for the 2-6-2 tanks was scheduled for 20 loaded wagons, but has had to be reduced to 16. A number of Fairburn and Stanier 2-6-4 tanks, which have been at Bangor for some time, have recently departed to Greenock, and from the latter shed two of the parallel boiler Fowler type have been received in exchange, Nos. 42415/6. The present L.Y.R. contingent, employed on shunting at Menai Bridge Sidings, local trips and on the Bangor Harbour branch, comprised Nos. 52219, 52269/70. The only L.N.W.R. locomotive seen at Bangor was No. 49416 of 8D, which had arrived the previous day with a load of sleepers. The other 'visitors' were No. 45595 of 9A and one of the inevitable 'Austerity' 2-8-0's from Mold Junction. SLS/195407
17/08/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay) Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. SLS/195909
14/08/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. SLS/196109
19/09/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: D3058, D3250, D8003, 41835, 42415, 44232, 47236, 47373, 47651, 48004, 48112, 48377, 75041. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2415
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42415    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
21/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12H)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42415    
07/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev