Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 40 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4955 Week
» 16192 Month
» 249112 Year
» 1914488 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2417 on 20/11/1933
British Railways 42417 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/11/1933
Withdrawal Sat 11/04/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/11/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6H   Bangor 4w/e 24/04/1954
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 06/10/1956
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 09/01/1960
21A   Saltley w/e 20/08/1960
     Withdrawn on 11/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Greenock Ladyburn w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/08/1960
WDN   w/e 11/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-40154 25/4; 40176 24/5; 40189 16/4; 40570 (3508) 22/4; 40613 (3465) 4/5; 40620 (3509) 6/5; 40624 (3957) 16/4; *40641 (3325) 20/4; 40664 (3515) 28/4; 40670 (3960) 17/5; 40689 (3533) 23/5; *41092 (2861) 28/4; 41132 (4148) 28/4; 41145 (4348) 16/4; 41176 (3529) 16/5; 41180 (3890) 8/4; 42201 5/4; 42415 23/4; 42417 13/5; 42751 (4188) 10/5; 42780 (4442) 20/5; 42802 (3310) 28/5; 42809 (3956) 21/5; 42830 (3772) 1/4; 42834 (3911) 7/4; 42876 (4211) 5/4; 43902 (2991) 14/5; 44330 (3825) 13/4;; 44795 (10685) 21/4; *44799 (10689) 5/5;; 44931 (10556) 11/5; *44959 (10584) 6/4; 44973 (10598) 29/4; 44991 (10616) 30/4; 45009 (9264) 7/5; 45013 (9511) 10/4; 45014 (9184) 28/4; *45087 (9724) 7/4; 45100 (9261) 26/5; 45115 (9278) 12/5; 45116 (9060) 15/4; *45119 (9365) 22/4; 45122 (9265) 8/4; 45124 (9214) 22/4; 45153 (9314) 28/4; 45157 (9545) 5/5; 45166 (9210) 28/4; 45167 (9181) 30/4; 45171 (9194) 17/5; 45177 (9659) 16/5; *45251 (9276) 2/4; 45357 (9534) 13/4; 45360 (9715) 23/4; 45389 (9625) 9/4; *45423 (9595) 8/4; *45456 (9059) 16/4; 45464 (9296) 30/5; 45469 (9596) 19/4; 45482 (9828) 24/5; 45487 (9833) 20/5; 45491 (9538) 23/5; *45577 (9027) 6/4; 45581 (9077) 12/4; 45715 (3944) 27/4; 45730 (9709) 22/4; 47163 20/4; 54438 (6057) 5/4; *54444 (2662) 16/4; 54445 (6062) 30/4; 54455 (6182) 20/5; *54471 (6178) 24/5; 55138 23/4; 55178 1/6; 55210 20/5; 55356 8/4; 56038 30/4; 56153 18/5; 56238 9/4; 56249 2/6; 56254 2/6; 56272 23/4; 56281 20/4; 56310 15/4; 56359 28/4; 57243 (927) 20/4;; 57261 (1757) 4/5;; 57268 (1659) 6/5;; 57289 (1738) 14/4;; 57291 (1741) 21/5; 57292 (1635) 26/5; *57298 (936) 30/4; 57307 (971) 11/5; 57310 (1231) 13/5; 57389 (1309) 25/5; 57464 (1327) 24/5; *57556 (1632) 24/5; 57562 (1643) 26/4; 57573 (1693) 7/5; 57588 (1669) 27/5; 57608 (1689) 12/5; 57631 (1712) 28/5; 57665 (1746) 19/4; 57695 (1874) 23/5. *Retains L.M.S. on tender.
Nos. 4998 and 4999 entered the Varnish Shop on 17/5 and 18/5 respectively, where they have since been painted black with red, white and grey lining and re-numbered 44998 and 44999 in straw numerals. New smokebox number plates have also been fitted. No. M914 arrived at the Works on 4/5 with L.M.S. tender No. 3188, having exchanged its British Railways tender (4014) with engine No. 2910 at Corkerhill. The engine has since been renumbered 40914 (on 17/5) but retains L.M.S. on the tender. No. 56020 returned to the Works on 5/5 after running-in trials and was loaded on to a 40-ton well wagon on 12/5 and despatched, with its wheels and material in a 12-ton open wagon to Burton-on-Trent shed on 14/5. Nos. 16279 an 16341 arrived at the Works on 26/5 still retaining smokebox number plates-since removed
SLS/194807
28/02/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40188, 41099. 41133. 42172. 42417, 42834. 4323. 57565/69. SLS/195004
09/03/1953 Paisley accident On 9th March, No. 42417, hauling fifteen goods wagons to Greenock, jumped the points at Blackstone Siding and toppled down a low embankment, the crew escaping serious injury. The scene of the accident was between Paisley and Georgetown. Polmadie breakdown crew cleared the loop line involved, the main line to Greenock not being affected. SLS/195304
31/10/1959 Chester Northgate MPD Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. SLS/196003
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
01/10/1962 Redditch-Ashchurch From 1st October the section of line between Broom Junc. and Evesham is to be closed completely. The Redditch-Ashchurch service is still with the T.U.C.C. but the Engineer has refused to be responsible for any further traffic between Broom and Evesham after Saturday, 29th September. This section of line has the new sleepers waiting for installation, but apparently the expenditure will not be sanctioned. It is understood that buses will operate between Evesham and Alcester (or Redditch) from 1/10 to replace the passenger trains, and goods traffice will be suspended except that Alcester will be open for goods traffic (via Redditch). On Saturday, 22nd September, 42400/17/21 were all working on the branch trains through from Birmingham New St.-Ashchurch and Jinty' 47308 replaced 42421 on the 11-38 a.m. Redditch-Ashchurch, back with the 1-15 p.m. from Ashchurch-Redditch. 42421 resumed with the 2-55 p.m. ex Redditch and apparently this has been a regular working of a Jinty on Saturdays. MR Class 3s (and GW PTs) have been noted but it is believed that GW PTs cannot work the Redditch sidings-wherefore the keeping of 47296 at Bromsgrove to change with 47308. SLS/196210
04/12/1963 Saltley MPD Of the Fowler 2-6-4Ts, 42419 was condemned 4th December, 42417 is waiting works (?) leaving 42400/16/21 in traffic, although Drivers complain they have inadequate brake power on goods trains. 46505/26/9 have arrived, the latter two green; some Class 4Fs are to come out of store, probably for Bescot in lieu of LNW Super Ds. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2417
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42417    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
11/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42417    
05/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev