Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2418 on 22/11/1933
British Railways 42418 w/e 20/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 22/11/1933
Withdrawal Sat 09/04/1960
Service Life 26 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/11/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6H   Bangor 4w/e 24/04/1954
5C   Stafford 4w/e 06/10/1956
5D   Stoke 4w/e 20/04/1957
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1959
91W   To Western Region / GWR w/e 29/08/1959
5D   Stoke w/e 12/09/1959
     Withdrawn on 09/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 20/04/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 84G*   4w/e 21/02/1959
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/02/1959
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 3w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   w/e 09/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1949 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 40187, 575, 614, 40670, 40914, 1138, 42416/18, 42751, 42830, 2875, 42912/14, 4011, 4198, 44234, 4881/86/99, 44900/31/77, 45008, 45120/55/60/65/66/70/92, 45423, 5432, 45452/61/89, 45577/84, 45643, 15141/89, 15211/37, 55356, 16162, 16247/75/95, 56359, 17282, 17411, 17554, 57619, 17625/67. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2418
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
20/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42418    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
04/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    
09/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 42418    

prev prev