Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 838 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1912 Week
» 27273 Month
» 260193 Year
» 1925569 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2419 on 28/11/1933
British Railways 42419 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Thu 28/11/1933
Withdrawal During 11/1963
Service Life 29 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/11/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 06/10/1951
66D   Greenock Ladyburn 8w/e 19/04/1952
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 27/03/1954
5D   Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1956
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 19/05/1956
21A   Saltley w/e 05/11/1960
     Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 21A Saltley 5w/e 03/12/1960
WDN   on 04/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/12/1963 Saltley MPD Of the Fowler 2-6-4Ts, 42419 was condemned 4th December, 42417 is waiting works (?) leaving 42400/16/21 in traffic, although Drivers complain they have inadequate brake power on goods trains. 46505/26/9 have arrived, the latter two green; some Class 4Fs are to come out of store, probably for Bescot in lieu of LNW Super Ds. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2419
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42419    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42419    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev