Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 772 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1846 Week
» 27207 Month
» 260127 Year
» 1925503 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2420 on 01/12/1933
British Railways 42420 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 01/12/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/05/1962
Service Life 28 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/12/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 06/10/1951
66D   Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/03/1952
66D   Greenock Ladyburn 8w/e 19/04/1952
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 27/03/1954
5D   Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1956
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1959
91W   To Western Region / GWR w/e 29/08/1959
5D   Stoke w/e 12/09/1959
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 20/08/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 19/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 22/03/1952
LOAN 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1956
TOSTORE   4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 84G*   4w/e 21/02/1959
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 28/02/1959
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 27/08/1960
WDN   w/e 19/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
17/09/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. SLS/195810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/12/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2420
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42420    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
05/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    
19/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42420    

prev prev