Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 261 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5661 Week
» 23713 Month
» 256633 Year
» 1922009 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2421 on 06/12/1933
British Railways 42421 w/e 28/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/12/1933
Withdrawal Sat 22/08/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/12/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 27/03/1954
5D   Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1956
6H   Bangor 4w/e 11/08/1956
5C   Stafford 4w/e 06/10/1956
5D   Stoke 4w/e 20/04/1957
21A   Saltley w/e 20/08/1960
5C   Stafford w/e 20/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 22/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 22/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 St. Rollox Works Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows: Nos. 40604 (3983) 27/8; 40647 (4368) 20/8; *40905 (3787) 17/8; 40908 (3780) 16/8; 41136 (3590) 15/8; 42421 26/8; 42877 (4332) 25/8; 42915 (4016) 30/8; 42918 (3947) 31/8; 44234 (3368) 13/8; 44281 (3415) 10/8; 45005 (9592) 1/9; 45047 (9716) 9/8; 45121 (9826) 22/8; 45455 (9668) 20/8; 45457 (9198) 22/8; 45474 (9820) 11/8; 45483 (9555) 2/9; 45499 (9101) 11/8; 45560 (9062) 6/8; 54446 (6065) 1/9; 54448 (6067) 19/8; 54464 (6170) 12/8; 54465 (6171) 1/9; 54473 (6200) 10/8; 54639 (2678) 18/8; 55164 15/8; 55221 23/8; 56025 19/8; 56155 30/8; 56276 2/9; 57271 (6034) 18/8; 57337 (975) 15/8; 57445 (1243) 3/9; 57453 (1326) 12/8; 57599 (1680) 9/8; *Retains L.M.S. on the tender. With the exception of Nos. 44234, 45047, 45560, 54464, 54639, 55164, 56276, and 57599, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number plates. In addition No. M5693 was re-numbered 45693 on 26/8, and No. 45692 (9710) and No. 57614 (1700) received new smokebox number plates on 20/8 and 23/8 respectively.
No. 56025 went back into service as Works 'pug' on 20/8 and No. 16030 was towed away to Balornock shed on the same date.
No. 55180, one of the engines in the Mail crash, was brought into the shops, ex dump, on 20/8, where it has since been cut-up; No. 5716, the other engine, is still in the dump
SLS/194810
30/04/1950 St. Rollox Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 153, 40598, 615, 40647, 41092, 42205/06, 42421, 42908, 44283, 44702/03/84/96, 4923, 44931/59/74/79/91, 45009/22/23, 45159/73, 45251, 45362, 45456/62, 45714/27, 54440, 55139, 15168, 15352, 16154, 16250/80, 16307, 56335, 16350, 17253, 57463, 57955. SLS/195006
19/12/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop: 1 bay) Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. SLS/195901
31/07/1961 Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. SLS/196109
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
05/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. SLS/196112
17/11/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on Shed) Ex-Works on Shed: D211, D5024, 41804, 42421, 44241, 48185, 48467, 73073, 75030/52. SLS/196112
01/10/1962 Redditch-Ashchurch From 1st October the section of line between Broom Junc. and Evesham is to be closed completely. The Redditch-Ashchurch service is still with the T.U.C.C. but the Engineer has refused to be responsible for any further traffic between Broom and Evesham after Saturday, 29th September. This section of line has the new sleepers waiting for installation, but apparently the expenditure will not be sanctioned. It is understood that buses will operate between Evesham and Alcester (or Redditch) from 1/10 to replace the passenger trains, and goods traffice will be suspended except that Alcester will be open for goods traffic (via Redditch). On Saturday, 22nd September, 42400/17/21 were all working on the branch trains through from Birmingham New St.-Ashchurch and Jinty' 47308 replaced 42421 on the 11-38 a.m. Redditch-Ashchurch, back with the 1-15 p.m. from Ashchurch-Redditch. 42421 resumed with the 2-55 p.m. ex Redditch and apparently this has been a regular working of a Jinty on Saturdays. MR Class 3s (and GW PTs) have been noted but it is believed that GW PTs cannot work the Redditch sidings-wherefore the keeping of 47296 at Bromsgrove to change with 47308. SLS/196210
04/12/1963 Saltley MPD Of the Fowler 2-6-4Ts, 42419 was condemned 4th December, 42417 is waiting works (?) leaving 42400/16/21 in traffic, although Drivers complain they have inadequate brake power on goods trains. 46505/26/9 have arrived, the latter two green; some Class 4Fs are to come out of store, probably for Bescot in lieu of LNW Super Ds. SLS/196401
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Works Yard) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2421
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
28/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42421    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
22/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42421    
10/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev