Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 255 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5655 Week
» 23707 Month
» 256627 Year
» 1922003 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2422 on 11/12/1933
British Railways 42422 w/e 01/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 11/12/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/12/1962
Service Life 29 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Tue 26/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/12/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 27/03/1954
1A   Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
27C   Southport w/e 08/08/1959
1A   Willesden w/e 19/09/1959
8E   Northwich w/e 30/07/1960
21A   Saltley w/e 20/08/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 22/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 27C Southport 8w/e 05/09/1959
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 27/08/1960
WDN   w/e 22/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/10/1949 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 594, 609, 40667, 939, 1139, 42422, 42808, 2911, 46635, 14503, 17230, 57319, 17457, 17563, 57614, 17627. SLS/194911
17/09/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195910
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
12/03/1963 Derby Works (Works yard) D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196304
30/04/1963 Oswestry Works (Works yard) Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2422
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
01/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42422    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42422    
26/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev