Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 765 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1839 Week
» 27200 Month
» 260120 Year
» 1925496 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2423 on 19/12/1933
British Railways 42423 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 19/12/1933
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 19/12/1933
27B   Greenock Ladyburn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 27/03/1954
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 26/03/1955
10C   Patricroft 4w/e 06/10/1956
5E   Alsager 4w/e 10/08/1957
9C   Macclesfield 8w/e 05/10/1957
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 22/03/1958
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 10C Patricroft 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 5E Alsager 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 22/03/1958
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 St. Rollox Works The first ex C.R. tender locomotives to be painted black and fully lined were:-Nos. 54475 (4/4), 54492 and 54636 (16/4). Additional locomotives painted in the same style include:-Nos. 40688, 40903, 42423, 42741, 42905, 55146/62 an 55217. Ex H.R. 0-4-4T No. 15051 was ex Works, re-numbered 55051, on 19/4, so that now both the remaining locomotives of this class have recently been through St. Rollox Works. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/12/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2423
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Greenock Ladyburn (27B)    
02/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42423    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Alsager (5E)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42423    
09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev