Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 235 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5635 Week
» 23687 Month
» 256607 Year
» 1921983 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2424 on 15/01/1934
British Railways 42424 w/e 22/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 15/01/1934
Withdrawal Sat 26/09/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/01/1934
11E   Tebay on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 30/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 26/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 26/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/01/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2424
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tebay (11E)    
22/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42424    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
26/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42424    
04/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev