Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 283 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1984 Week
» 10099 Month
» 137542 Year
» 1802918 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2431 on 10/03/1936
British Railways 42431 w/e 15/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P10/03/1936
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/03/1936
Withdrawal Sat 07/05/1966
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/03/1936
11A   Carnforth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke w/e 19/02/1949
6A   Chester (MR) 8w/e 05/10/1957
6H   Bangor w/e 06/08/1960
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 20/08/1960
1A   Willesden w/e 23/02/1963
10C   Fleetwood w/e 29/05/1965
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 19/02/1966
     Withdrawn on 07/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 05/10/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 12/03/1966
WDN   w/e 07/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D105-8/10, 45139, 45403, 45584, 45626, 46146, 78021. Outside Paint Shop: D97, D109, 41222/66, 42286, 44910, 45397, 45694, 46127, 46246, 49395, 92020. Works Sidings: 41269, 42441/78, 42604, 44685, 44714/66, 44832, 44907, 45021, 45208/34/96, 45438, 45535/91, 45641, 46125/8, 46404, 48525, 90163, 90388, 90595, 92033/74. Erecting Shop: D114-9, 41218/42, 42226/96, 42431, 42559, 42625/64, 44682, 44715, 44875/92, 44946, 45056/70/80, 45107/9, 45222/38/42, 45310/27/42, 45415/26/37, 45510/23/55/64, 45703/17, 46117, 46222/9/32/8, 46429, 46509, 48258, 48305/35/93, 48409/36, 48549/53/6, 48760, 49447, 70004, 78061, 90251/76, 90557, 90685, 90724, 92087, 92132. Outside Erecting Shop: 42227, 44874, 45686, 45734, 46116/70. New Erecting Shop: D111-3/20-4, D222. Scrap Yard: 40002, 40658/91, 43225, 43459, 47374, 52240/60, 52464, 52526 all intact, with 40502 being cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 44373/4, 47592, 47648, 51441/4/6, 52093, 52312. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/03/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2431
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A)    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42431    
19/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
06/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
07/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42431    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev