Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2455 on 22/08/1936
British Railways 42455 w/e 29/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P22/08/1936
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 22/08/1936
Withdrawal Sat 02/04/1966
Service Life 29 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/08/1936
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 08/01/1949
6H   Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1952
26D   Bury 4w/e 06/10/1956
24E   Blackpool Central w/e 20/06/1959
8C   Speke Junction w/e 21/12/1963
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 20/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 02/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 02/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2455
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42455    
08/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
02/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42455    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev