Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 544 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3470 Week
» 5208 Month
» 132651 Year
» 1798027 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2486 on 18/03/1937
British Railways 42486 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P18/03/1937
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 18/03/1937
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Service Life 26 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/03/1937
26A   Newton Heath on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17C   Rowsley 4w/e 09/08/1958
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 17/03/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 28/04/1962
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 17D Rowsley 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/10/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-42486 cut-up, D92, D2508, D2910, D3050/5/82, D3323/67, 12037/43; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D87, D5000/17/33, D5134/8; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(new construction)-D5233-47new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D35, D46/9, D69, D74, D100/12/21/2/9/36/46, D5003. Finishing Shop: D9, D72, D147, D3089, D5004/22, D7577. Paint Shop: D91, D3054, D7574. Test House: D62/4/8, D115, D2505, D2902/7, D3335, D5015, D5216, D5393, D7572/5/6. Stone Pit: 44539. Foundry Row: 41537, 42500, 44176, 47679, 63806/38, D63, D2506, D2913, D3121, 10001, 12082. ED6 an ED7 dumped awaiting parts from J. Fowler. Yard: Klondyke, D52, D154, D7573 an ED4. SLS/196311

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2486
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
18/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42486    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
28/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42486    
10/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev