Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2544 |
on |
23/12/1935 |
British Railways |
42544 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 23/12/1935 to Stoke (5D) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/12/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
ALLOC |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
6H |
Bangor |
6w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
30/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
21E |
Monument Lane |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
5w/e |
03/03/1962 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/08/1956 |
West Cumberland Visit |
SLS members gathered by devious routes in the Citadel station at Carlisle, the writer travelling G. & S.W. from Glasgow 'spotting' ex G.E. 2-4-2T No. 67157 awaiting scrapping at Kilmarnock works with several compound 4-4-0's and K2 2-6-0's. While at Dumfries the last of the McIntosh 19' Class 0-4-4T's (No. 55124) was seen, the London Midland Region striving to cope with large holiday crowds. Matters were not improved by the 'Royal Scot' being halted for a quarter of an hour at platform 3 for its Pacific, 46224, to be replaced by 46252. Our connection, the Perth-London, departed 21½ minutes late at 1-16½ behind 46242 and on arrival at Penrith it was found that temporary alterations had been made in the service on the C.K. & P.-the 1-30 p.m. to Workington followed the through train from Manchester to Keswick. This comprised Class 2MT 2-6-0's Nos. 46456/7, coupled tender to tender, with eight corridors. Traversing Lakeland in brilliant sunshine, after early rain, we descended at tree-shaded Keswick and continued by the retimed 1-30 which was worked by 46491. At Workington (Main), reached at 3-49, a visit was paid to the shed where the centre of attraction was ex-Furness 0-6-0 No. 52499 (with L. & Y. boiler). Another of these locos., 52510, was seen on a freight. The plan to return immediately to Carlisle to do Silloth had now to be abandoned, in any case on Saturdays this branch is taken over from the diesels by J39's and instead we carried on along the coast to Whitehaven by the 4-28 (3.25 ex-Carlisle) which was another steam train-2-6-4T No. 42544 with four packed coaches. At Whitehaven (Bransty) cameras were focussed on un-rebuilt Patriot No. 45542 which came in with a train from the south. Earlier, Stanier 2-6-0 No. 42962 had been seen on one of these, before rejoining the train which now formed the 5-15 to Carlisle. However, some diehards waited for the 6-15 departure and at last ran a diesel set to earth. After traversing the erstwhile Maryport and Carlisle line, the Citadel station was reached 2 minutes late at 6-40 p.m. when a final spot of excitement was provided by our using the same platform as the empty stock of the Royal Train which, that morning, had arrived at Appleby with the Queen and Duke of Edinburgh. It departed northwards in charge of Class SMT 4-6-0's Nos. 44676 an 45455. |
SLS/195610 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2544 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42544 |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
10/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42544 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|