|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/06/1954 | Lakeside Branch | With numerous black-headed gulls perched on the carriage roofs, three return excursions (two corridor, one not) were noted standing in Lakeside Station, Newby Bridge, on this Sunday afternoon. All were worked by Stanier 2-6-4T, Nos. 42571 (11B), 42589 (11E) and 42591 (11A). | SLS/195408 |
26/11/1961 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2571 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24327 |
||
22/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B) | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) | ||
04/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42571 | ||
23/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) | ||
28/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rugby (2A) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) | ||
11/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J) | ||
02/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxenholme (12G) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) | ||
09/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42571 | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |