Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2571 on 11/09/1936
British Railways 42571 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4P11/09/1936
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L896
Works Number 24327
To Service Sat 11/09/1936
Withdrawal Sat 09/11/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/09/1936
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 22/06/1946
11B   Barrow in Furness on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 23/02/1957
2A   Rugby 4w/e 28/12/1957
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 25/01/1958
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 11/06/1960
12G   Oxenholme w/e 02/07/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 09/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 23/02/1957
LOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957
EXLOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 12G Oxenholme 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 09/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/06/1954 Lakeside Branch With numerous black-headed gulls perched on the carriage roofs, three return excursions (two corridor, one not) were noted standing in Lakeside Station, Newby Bridge, on this Sunday afternoon. All were worked by Stanier 2-6-4T, Nos. 42571 (11B), 42589 (11E) and 42591 (11A). SLS/195408
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/09/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2571
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24327
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B)    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42571    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
11/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
02/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxenholme (12G)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
09/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42571    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev