Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2573 |
on |
11/09/1936 |
British Railways |
42573 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
ALLOC |
2E |
Northampton |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
5w/e |
04/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1945 |
Manchester (London Road) Station |
Interesting locos seen during October included: 2573 10C, 4848 20A, 4076 2C, 4885 12A, 4901 12A, 4904, 5168 30A, 5284 19E |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/09/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2573 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24329 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (11A) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42573 |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42573 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|